Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-489
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-489
Title:Bradley Weston Taggart, Petitioner
v.
Shelley A. Lorenzen, Executor of the Estate of Stuart Brown, et al.
Docketed:October 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35402, 16-60032, 16-60033, 16-60039, 16-60040, 16-60042, 16-60043)
   Decision Date:April 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Bradley Weston Taggart.
Blanket Consent
Oct 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2018 to December 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2018.
Nov 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Honorable Eugene Wedoff (ret.), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2018Brief of respondents Shelley Lorenzen, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 20 2018Reply of petitioner Bradley Weston Taggart filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Bradley Weston Taggart.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 24, 2019
Feb 19 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief of petitioner Bradley Weston Taggart filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Honorable Eugene Wedoff (ret.), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 26 2019Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and The National Association of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys filed. (Corrected version submitted)
Feb 26 2019Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and The National Association of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys filed (3/11/2019).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 21 2019Brief of respondents Shelley Lorenzen, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit and the U.S. Bankruptcy Court District of Oregon is electronic and located on Pacer, with the exception of some restricted district court documents that is electronic. The record is complete.
Mar 27 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 28 2019Brief amici curiae of State of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Creditors Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 17 2019Reply of petitioner Bradley Weston Taggart filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2019Argued. For petitioner: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex. For United States, as amicus curiae: Sopan Joshi, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Nicole A. Saharsky, Washington, D. C.
Jun 03 2019Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Bradley Weston Taggart
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3052
Party name: Shelley Lorenzen, et al.
Michael B. KimberlyMayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: Shelley Lorenzen, et al.
Hollis Keith McMilanHollis K. McMilan, P.C.
4504 SW Corbett Ave., Ste 210B
Portland, OR 97239

hmcmilan@hkmlaw.com
503 972-5092
Party name: Keith Jehnke, Terry W. Emmert, and Sherwood Park Business Center LLC
Other
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-9544
Party name: Honorable Eugene Wedoff (ret.), Honorable Leif Clark (ret. and a group of law professors
Karli Ann Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

karli.eisenberg@doj.ca.gov
9162107913
Party name: State of California, et al.
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Nicole Marie Strickler
    Counsel of Record
Messer Strickler, Ltd .
225 W. Washington St.,Ste. 575
Chicago, IL 60606

nstrickler@messerstrickler.com
3123343442
Party name: National Creditors Bar Association
Tara Twomey
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center
1501 The Alameda
San Jose, CA 93921

tara.twomey@comcast.net
8312290256
Party name: National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and The National Association of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543