Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-483
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-483
Title:Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc., et al.
Docketed:October 16, 2018
Linked with 18A284
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3163)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2018Application (18A284) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 23, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 19 2018Application (18A284) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 22, 2018.
Oct 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. filed.
Main Document
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians & Surgeons filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Americans United for Life, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Wisconsin, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of The Restoration Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Fondation Jerome Lejeune, Saving Down Syndrome, and Down Pride filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Susan B. Anthony List filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom and the Radiance Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Educational and Legal Defense Fund, Inc. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Beverly McMillan, M.D. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Amicus brief of Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas not accepted for filing. (November 20, 2018)(Corrected version submitted)
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Pro-Life Legal Defense Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice, et al. filed. (11/20/208)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2018Amicus brief of American Center for Law & Justice and Parents of Disabled Children not accepted for filing. (November 20, 2018)(Corrected version submitted)
Nov 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Brief of respondents Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Commissioner of the Indiana State Department of Health, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kenneth J. Falk
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of Indiana
1031 E. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46202

kfalk@aclu-in.org
3176354059
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc., et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
2101 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 525
Arlington, VA 22201

Steven.Aden@aul.org
202-741-4917
Party name: Americans United for Life and Charlotte Lozier Institute
Ryan C. Berry
    Counsel of Record
Ward & Berry, PLLC
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 4500
Washington, DC 20006

ryan@wardberry.com
202-331-8160
Party name: Susan B. Anthony List
Dorinda C. Bordlee
    Counsel of Record
Bioethics Defense Fund
3312 Cleary Avenue
Metairie, LA 70002

dbordlee@bdfund.org
5042317234
Party name: Fondation Jerome Lejeune, Saving Downs, Down Pride
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Restoration Project, Pastor Joseph Parker, Everlasting Light Ministries, Protect Life and Marriage Texas, Thomas More Society
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern B aptist Convention, et al.
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
University of St. Thomas School of Law
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: Prolife Center at the University of St. Thomas
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Educational and Legal Defense Fund
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Pro-Life Legal Defense Fund, Eleanor McCullen, One Nation Under God Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Pass the Salt Ministries, Liberty Fellowship, Pastor Chuck Baldwin, Fitzgerald Griffin Foundation, Policy Analysis Center, Restoring Liberty Action Committee, and Center for Morality
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Association of American Physicians & Surgeons
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202)546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice and Parents of Disabled Children
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 1313
Ojai, CA 93024-1313

lldfojai@earthlink.net
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Beverly McMillan, M.D.
Kevin Hayden Theriot
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 1st Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ktheriot@ADFlegal.org
202-393-8690
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom and the Radiance Foundation
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Dept. of Justice
17 W. Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: State of Wisconsin, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543