Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-468
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-468
Title:SSL Services, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Cisco Systems, Inc.
Docketed:October 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1951)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2018Waiver of right of respondent Cisco Systems, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Alliance for U.S. Startups & Inventors for Jobs (USIJ) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alan Michael Fisch
    Counsel of Record
FISCH SIGLER LLP
5301 Wisconsin Avenue NW
Fourth Floor
Washington, DC 20015

alan.fisch@fischllp.com
202-362-3500
Party name: SSL Services, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
David L McCombs
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue,Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75219

david.mccombs@haynesboone.com
(972) 739-8636
Party name: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Other
Robert P. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
RPT LEGAL STRATEGIES, PC
2443 Fillmore Street
Ste. 332
San Francisco, CA 94115

robert.taylor@rptstrategies.com
415-447-3975
Party name: Alliance for U.S. Startups & Inventors for Jobs (USIJ)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543