Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-462
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-462
Title:Bobbie Gunderson, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Indiana, et al.
Docketed:October 12, 2018
Linked with 18A109
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(46S03-1706-PL-00423)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2018Application (18A109) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2018 to October 5, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Application (18A109) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 5, 2018.
Oct 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for State of Indiana, et al. not accepted for filing. (November 02, 2018) (Corrected version submitted November 2, 2018).
Nov 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2018 to January 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 02 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State of Indiana and the Indiana Department of Natural Resources.(Amended version submitted 11/2/2018)
Blanket Consent
Nov 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Bobbie Gunderson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 11, 2019, for all respondents.
Nov 09 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Minnesota Association of Realtors.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Brief of respondent-Intervenors Alliance for the Great Lakes, Save the Dunes in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Brief of respondent-Intervenors Long Beach Community Alliance; et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Brief of State of Indiana and the Indiana Department of Natural Resources in opposition not accepted for filing. (Corrected Version Submitted)(January 24, 2019)
Jan 11 2019Brief of respondents State of Indiana, et al. in opposition filed. (1/22/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2019Reply of petitioners Bobbie Gunderson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Minnesota Association of Realtors GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al. GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aaron D. Van Oort
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
2200 Wells Fargo Center
90 South 7th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

aaron.vanoort@faegrebd.com
612-766-8138
Party name: Bobbie Gunderson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana and the Indiana Department of Natural Resources
Jeffrey Bruce Hyman
    Counsel of Record
Conservation Law Center
116 S. Indiana Ave.
Bloomington, IN 47408

jbhyman@indiana.edu
812-856-5737
Party name: Alliance for the Great Lakes, Save the Dunes
Patricia Fern Sharkey
    Counsel of Record
Environmental Law Counsel, P.C.
180 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 3700
Chicago, IL 60601

psharkey@environmentallawcounsel.com
312-981-0404
Party name: Long Beach Community Alliance; Patrick Cannon; John Wall; Michael Salmon; and Thomas King
Other
Mark Fernlund Hearne II
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox, LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thornet@ix.netcom.com
202-857-6000
Party name: Cato Institute, National Association of Reversionary Property Owners, Save our Shoreline and Whalesback Preservation Fund, LLC
Scott Gregory Knudson
    Counsel of Record
Briggs & Morgan
2200 IDS Center
80 South Eighth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

sknudson@briggs.com
612-977-8279
Party name: Minnesota Association of REALTORS

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543