Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-460
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-460
Title:Walter Daniel, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rebekah Daniel, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35203)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Nov 28 2018Response Requested. (Due December 28, 2018)
Dec 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2018 to January 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 28, 2019.
Jan 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2019 to February 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 27, 2019.
Feb 27 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Mar 21 2019Reply of petitioner Walter Daniel filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. Andrew Hoyal II
    Counsel of Record
Luvera Law Firm
701 Fifth Avenue
Suite 6700
Seattle, WA 98104

Andy@luveralawfirm.com
2064676090
Party name: Walter Daniel
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543