Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-459
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-459
Title:Emulex Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gary Varjabedian, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55088)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2018 to November 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2018.
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondents Gary Varjabedian, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Reply of petitioners Emulex Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Gary Varjabedian, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 15, 2019
Feb 19 2019Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief of petitioners Emulex Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Commissioners of the Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Phillip Goldstein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Emulex Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Gary Varjabedian, et al.
Other
George Thomas Conway III
    Counsel of Record
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

gtconway@wlrk.com
(212) 403-1230
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES
Marc J. Gottridge
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

marc.gottridge@hoganlovells.com
212-918-3000
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Alan E. Golomb
    Counsel of Record
Attorney And Counsellor At Law
492 Bardini Drive
Melville, NY 11747

aandp492@aol.com
(516) 509-0509
Party name: Phillip Goldstein
Jonathan L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

jonathan.marcus@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Former Commissioners of the Securities and Exchange Commission
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543