Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-451
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-451
Title:Aloha Bed & Breakfast, Petitioner
v.
Diane Cervelli, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:Intermediate Court of Appeals of Hawaii
   Case Numbers:(CAAP-13-0000806)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 10, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Aloha Bed & Breakfast, A Hawai`i Sole Proprietorship.
Blanket Consent
Nov 09 2018Waiver of right of respondent Willam D. Hoshijo, as Executive Director of the Hawai'i Civil Rights Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 12 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOther
Nov 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Amicus brief of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention not accepted for filing. (November 19, 2018)(Corrected Version Submitted).
Nov 13 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention.(11/16/2018)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Waiver of right of respondents Diane Cervelli and Taeko Bufford to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 13 2018Amicus brief of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention not accepted for filing.(11/16/2018)(Corrected Version submitted)
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Nov 29 2018Response Requested. (Due January 2, 2019)
Dec 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2019 to February 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2019 to February 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2018The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time to file is extended to and including February 1, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 01 2019Brief of respondent Willam D. Hoshijo, as Executive Director of the Hawai'i Civil Rights Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Brief of respondents Diane Cervelli and Taeko Bufford in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Reply of petitioner Aloha Bed & Breakfast, A Hawai`i Sole Proprietorship filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law GRANTED.
Mar 18 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention GRANTED.
Mar 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lloyd James Hochberg Jr.
    Counsel of Record
James Hochberg, AAL LLLC
Suite 2100
700 Bishop Street
Honolulu, HI 96813

jim@JamesHochbergLaw.com
808-256-7382
Party name: Aloha Bed & Breakfast, A Hawai`i Sole Proprietorship
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter C. Renn
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
4221 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 280
Los Angeles, CA 90010

prenn@lambdalegal.org
2133827600
Party name: Diane Cervelli and Taeko Bufford
Clyde James Wadsworth
    Counsel of Record
Dept. of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
425 Queen Street
Honolulu, HI 96813

clyde.j.wadsworth@hawaii.gov
808-586-1360
Party name: Willam D. Hoshijo, as Executive Director of the Hawai'i Civil Rights Commission
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Michael K. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Whitehead Law Firm LLC
229 SE DOUGLAS ST.
Suite 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

MIKEWHITEHEAD1@GMAIL.COM
8162104449
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543