Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-450
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-450
Title:Utah Republican Party, Petitioner
v.
Spencer J. Cox, Lieutenant Governor of Utah, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Linked with 18A216
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4091, 16-4098)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2018Application (18A216) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2018 to October 6, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Application (18A216) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 8, 2018.
Oct 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Utah Republican Party.
Blanket Consent
Nov 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of Private Citizen, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Utah Legislators, Current and Former filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Political Parties filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent Spencer J. Cox to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 14 2018Proof of service filed with respect to brief of amici curiae Political Parties. filed.
Other
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Sen. Mike Lee, Sen. Ted Cruz, Rep. Raul Labrador, and Rep. Rob Bishop filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 04 2018Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2019)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Utah Republican Party
Attorneys for Respondents
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Spencer J. Cox
Other
William C. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
1868 N 800 E
Lehi, UT 84043

billduncan56@gmail.com
(801)-367-4570
Party name: Utah Legislators, Current and Former
Edward Dean Greim
    Counsel of Record
Graves Garrett LLC
1100 Main Street
Suite 2700
Kansas City, MO 64105

edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
816-256-3181
Party name: Private Citizen, Inc.
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, and Freedom Partners Chambers of Commerce
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
James Roberts Troupis
    Counsel of Record
Troupis Law Office LLC
4126 Timber Lane
Cross Plains, WI 53528

judgetroupis@gmail.com
6086953520
Party name: Sen. Mike Lee, Sen. Ted Cruz, Rep. Raul Labrador, and Rep. Rob Bishop

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543