Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-441
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-441
Title:Accord Healthcare, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
UCB, Inc., et al.
Docketed:October 9, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2610, 2016-2683, 2016-2685, 2016-2698, 2016-2710, 2017-1001)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service
Oct 18 2018Waiver of right of respondents UCB, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicine filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Nov 19 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Richard G. Greco
    Counsel of Record
Richard G. Greco PC
157 West Meadows Drive
Rochester, NY 14616

rgreco@rggliberty.com
212-203-7625
Party name: Accord Healthcare, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam R. Gahtan
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West, LLP
902 Broadway, Suite 14
New York, NY 10010

agahtan@fenwick.com
212-430-2600
Party name: UCB, Inc., et al.
Other
Richard Jerold Hoskins
    Counsel of Record
Schiff Hardin LLP
233 S Wacker Drive
Suite 7100
Chicago, IL 60606

rhoskins@schiffhardin.com
312-258-5509
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicine

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543