Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-431
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-431
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Maurice Lamont Davis and Andre Levon Glover
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10330)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2018Letter of October 16, 2018 from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
Oct 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondent Andre Levon Glover in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondent Maurice Lamont Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Maurice Lamont Davis.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 04 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Maurice Lamont Davis GRANTED.
Jan 04 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover GRANTED.
Jan 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jan 29 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 17, 2019
Feb 12 2019Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 19 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Mar 14 2019Brief of Maurice Lamont Davis, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted.) (March 18, 2019)
Mar 14 2019Brief of respondents Maurice Lamont Davis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Mar 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2019Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 05 2019Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 17 2019Argued. For petitioner: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Brandon E. Beck, Assistant Federal Public Defender, Lubbock, Tex.
Apr 17 2019Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019Motion to appoint counsel GRANTED, and J. Joseph Mongaras, Esq., of Dallas, Texas, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent Andre L. Glover.
Jun 24 2019Adjudged to be AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, and case REMANDED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Kavanaugh, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined, and in which Roberts, C. J., joined as to all but Part II–C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Brandon Elliott Beck
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office, Northern District of Texas
1205 Texas Ave. #507
Lubbock, TX 79401

brandonebeck@gmail.com
806-472-7236
Party name: Maurice Lamont Davis, et al.
J. Joseph Mongaras Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Udashen Anton
2311 Cedar Springs, Suite 250
Dallas, TX 75201

jjm@udashenanton.com
214-468-8100
Party name: Andre Levon Glover
Other
Amy Baron-Evans
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Office
51 Sleeper Street, 5th Floor
Boston, MA 02210

abaronevans@gmail.com
6174292403
Party name: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL DEFENDERS
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8551
Party name: FAMM
Jonathan L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

jonathan.marcus@skadden.com
202-371-7596
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543