Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-414
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-414
Title:Carl M. Burnett, Petitioner
v.
Panasonic Corporation, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1234)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2018Waiver of right of respondents Panasonic Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carl M. Burnett12909 Hawkshead Terrace
Silver Spring, MD 20904

cmburn@live.com
(240) 355-1128
Party name: Carl M. Burnett
Attorneys for Respondents
Benjamin Michael Daniels
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin and Dana LLP
One Century Tower, P.O. Box 1832
New Haven, CT 06508-1832

bdaniels@wiggin.com
203-498-4350
Party name: Panasonic Corporation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543