Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-406
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-406
Title:Aaron J. Schock, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 1, 2018
Linked with 18A194
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3277)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2018Application (18A194) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 28, 2018 to September 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Application (18A194) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 27, 2018.
Sep 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 31, 2018 to November 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2018.
Oct 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Former General Counsels of the U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Dec 04 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 20 2018Reply of petitioner Aaron J. Schock filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George J. Terwilliger III
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
2001 K Street NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006-1040

gterwilliger@mcguirewoods.com
202 857 2473
Party name: Aaron J. Schock
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Andrew D. Herman
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

aherman@milchev.com
2026265800
Party name: Former General Counsels of the U.S. House of Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543