Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-396
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-396
Title:Brittan Holland, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kelly Rosen, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3104)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Waiver of right of respondents Kelly Rosen, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 10 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Brittan Holland, et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 10 2018Letter of October 10, 2018 from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Criminal Defense Attorneys filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Bail Agents Associations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Brittan Holland, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stuart Mark Feinblatt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of New Jersey
25 W. Market Street, P.O. Box 112
Trenton, NJ 08625

stuart.feinblatt@law.njoag.gov
(609) 376-3215
Party name: Kelly Rosen, et al.
Other
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Bail Agents Associations
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Criminal Defense Attorneys

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543