Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-394
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-394
Title:Denis P. Kelleher, et ux., Petitioners
v.
New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
Docketed:September 27, 2018
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Second Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(2015-09522)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 27, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2018 to December 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2018.
Oct 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 Northeast 33rd PLace, Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
425-576-0484
Party name: Denis and Carol Kelleher
Attorneys for Respondent
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
Other
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543