SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-39
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-39
Title:
Jason Lee Boyd, Petitioner
v.
Washington
Docketed:
July 6, 2018
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
Case Numbers:
(74933-1-I)
Decision Date:
December 11, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
April 4, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 13 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 08 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 30 2018
Response Requested. (Due October 1, 2018)
Sep 25 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 22, 2018.
Oct 22 2018
Brief of respondent State of Washington in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 02 2018
Reply of petitioner Jason Lee Boyd filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 07 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 28 2018
Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 10 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lila J. Silverstein
Counsel of Record
Washington Appellate Project
1511 Third Avenue
Suite 610
Seattle, WA 98101
lila@washapp.org
206-587-2711
Party name: Jason Lee Boyd
Attorneys for Respondent
Arne Orlando Denny
Counsel of Record
Skagit County Prosecutor's Office
605 South Third Street
Mount Vernon, WA 98273
arned@co.skagit.wa.us
(360) 416-1600
Party name: State of Washington
Erik Pedersen
Counsel of Record
Skagit County Prosecutor's Office
605 South Third Street
Mount Vernon, WA 98274
skagitappeals@co.skagit.wa.us
360-416-1600
Party name: Washington
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##