Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-386
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-386
Title:Joshua Vasquez, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kimberly Foxx, State's Attorney of Cook County, Illinois
Docketed:September 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1061)
   Decision Date:July 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 14, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018Waiver of right of respondent Kimberly Foxx to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Oct 24 2018Brief amici curiae of Eighteen Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2018Response Requested. (Due November 30, 2018)
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondent Kimberly Foxx, State's Attorney of Cook County, Illinois in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 28 2018Reply of petitioners Joshua Vasquez, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adele Diana Nicholas
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Adele D. Nicholas
5707 W. Goodman Street
Chicago, IL 60630

adele@civilrightschicago.com
8473613869
Party name: Joshua Vasquez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Anthony Castiglione
    Counsel of Record
Cook County State
500 Richard J. Daley Center
Chicago, IL 60602

paul.castiglione@cookcountyil.gov
(312) 603-2350
Party name: Kimberly Foxx
Other
Sean Hecker
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue
Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

shecker@kaplanhecker.com
(202) 763-0883
Party name: Eighteen Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543