Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-378
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-378
Title:Merck & Co., Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Docketed:September 24, 2018
Linked with 18A51
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2302, 2016-2615)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2018Application (18A51) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 24, 2018 to September 21, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Application (18A51) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 21, 2018.
Sep 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2018.
Oct 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of Celgene Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of Samuel L. Bray filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief of respondent Gilead Sciences, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2018Reply of petitioners Merck & Co., Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562000
Party name: Merck & Co., Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Other
Jennifer Loraine Swize
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jswize@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Celgene Corporation
David A. White
    Counsel of Record
McCarter & English
405 N. King Street, 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801

dwhite@mccarter.com
302-984-6300
Party name: Samuel L. Bray

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543