Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-351
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-351
Title:City of Pensacola, Florida, et al., Petitioners
v.
Amanda Kondrat'yev, et al.
Docketed:September 18, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13025)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Sep 21 2018Response of Amanda Kondrat'yev, et al. to motion not accepted for filing. (September 21, 2018) (Corrected response to be filed)
Sep 21 2018Response to motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari from respondents Amanda Kondrat'yev, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Reply in support of motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Brief amici curiae of The Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2018Supplemental letter from counsel for petitioners in response to motion filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioners DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2018.
Oct 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2018Amicus brief of Foundation for Moral Law submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2018Amicus brief of Junior Chamber International (JCI) Florida submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2018Amicus brief of City of Pensacola, Florida, et al submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Luke W. Goodrich
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lgoodrich@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: City of Pensacola, Florida, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Monica Lynn Miller
    Counsel of Record
American Humanist Association
1821 Jefferson Place NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmiller@americanhumanist.org
202-238-9088
Party name: Amanda Kondrat'yev, et al.
Other
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, Inc.
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
301-503-6329
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
1320 Main Street, 17 Floor
Columbia, SC 29201

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
803-799-2000
Party name: The Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, the Coalition for Jewish Values, and the Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Andrew Wade Guthrie
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75219

andrew.guthrie@haynesboone.com
(214) 651-5821
Party name: Junior Chamber International (JCI) Florida
Steven Troy Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

mnewman@ago.state.al.us
3342427300
Party name: City of Pensacola, Florida, et al
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

pzidlicky@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543