Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-33
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-33
Title:Subway Sandwich Shops, Inc., Petitioner
v.
David Moshe Rahmany, et al.
Docketed:July 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-35094)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent David Rahmany, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kristine McAlister Brown
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird
1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

kristy.brown@alston.com
4048817584
Party name: Subway Sandwich Shops, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
    Counsel of Record
Kazerouni Law Group APC
245 Fischer Ave., Suite D-1
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

ak@kazlg.com
800-400-6808
Party name: David Rahmany, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543