Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-323
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-323
Title:Suzan Evans, Individually and as Wife and Next of Kin of Scott Evans, Deceased, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:September 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5622)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 11, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Waiver of right of respondents United States, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Oct 22 2018Response Requested. (Due November 21, 2018)
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 21, 2018 to December 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 21, 2018.
Nov 15 2018Motion of United States, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (November 15, 2018 - duplicate submission)
Dec 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2018 to January 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 22, 2019.
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Reply of petitioner Suzan Evans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
T. Scott Jones
    Counsel of Record
Banks & Jones
2125 Middlebrook Pike
Knoxville, TN 37921

tscottjones@banksandjones.com
865-546-2141
Party name: Suzan Evans
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543