Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-317
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-317
Title:Alan Metzgar, et al., Petitioners
v.
KBR, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1960)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2018Waiver of right of respondents KBR, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 05 2018Response Requested. (Due November 14, 2018)
Oct 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2018 to December 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2018.
Dec 14 2018Brief of respondents KBR, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Reply of petitioners Alan Metzgar, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Susan L. Burke
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Susan L. Burke
1611 Park Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21217

sburke@burkepllc.com
410-733-5444
Party name: Alan Metzgar, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Warren Wayne Harris
    Counsel of Record
Bracewell, LLP
711 Louisiana Street
Suite 2300
Houston, TX 77002

warren.harris@bracewell.com
713-223-2300
Party name: KBR, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543