Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-308
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-308
Title:Anthony Rayshon Bethea, Petitioner
v.
North Carolina
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Linked with 17A1403
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(COA17-459)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 17, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Application (17A1403) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2018 to September 6, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 28 2018Application (17A1403) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 6, 2018.
Sep 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association for Rational Sexual Offense Laws et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 05 2018Response Requested. (Due December 5, 2018)
Dec 05 2018Brief of respondent State of North Carolina in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Reply of petitioner Anthony Rayshon Bethea filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Anthony Rayshon Bethea
Attorneys for Respondent
William Paul Hart
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
114 W. Edenton Street
Raleigh, NC 27603

whart@ncdoj.gov
919-716-6725
Party name: North Carolina
Matthew W. Sawchak
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Dept. of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

msawchak@ncdoj.gov
(919) 716-6429
Party name: State of North Carolina
Other
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
310-229-1000
Party name: Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Gambrell Hall
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: National Association for Rational Sexual Offense Laws and North Carolina Rational Sexual Offense Laws
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543