Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-306
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-306
Title:Steven M. Larrabee, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0114/MC)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 19 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 03 2018Response Requested. (Due November 2, 2018)
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 2, 2019.
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 3, 2018 to January 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Steven M. Larrabee
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543