Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-302
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-302
Title:Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner
v.
Erik Brunetti
Docketed:September 7, 2018
Linked with 18A15
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1109)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2018Application (18A15) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Application (18A15) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 10, 2018.
Jul 31 2018Application (18A15) to extend further the time from August 10, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Application (18A15) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 7, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2018 to November 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2018.
Nov 08 2018Brief of respondent Erik Brunetti filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 11 2018Reply of petitioners Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 15, 2019
Feb 15 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Brief of petitioner Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Kurt M. Anderson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Consents for amicus brief of Kurt M. Anderson not accepted for filing. (March 04, 2019 -- Document not of the type that is to be filed electronically)
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Brief of respondent Erik Brunetti filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Mar 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Simon Tam filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Barton Beebe and Jeanne Fromer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et. al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of International Trademark Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Apr 02 2019Reply of petitioner Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 15 2019Argued. For petitioner: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: John R. Sommer, Irvine, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Attorneys for Respondent
John R. Sommer
    Counsel of Record
John R. Sommer, Attorney-at-Law
17426 Daimler Street
Irvine, CA 92614

sommerjohnr@gmail.com
9497525344
Party name: Erik Brunetti
Other
Kurt Michael Anderson
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15667
Minneapolis, MN 55415-0667

kurt@kmalawmn.com
612-333-3185
Party name: Kurt M. Anderson
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Simon Tam
David H. Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise and Plimpton LLP
919 Third Ave.
New York, NY 10022

dhbernstein@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: INTERNATIONAL TRADEMARK ASSOCIATION
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbrown@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Michael Carl Cannata
    Counsel of Record
Rivkin Radler, LLP
926 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556

michael.cannata@rivkin.com
516-357-3000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-675-2330
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of the District of Columbia
Theodore H. Davis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
4048156534
Party name: The American Intellectual Property Law Association
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Professors Barton Beebe and Jeanne Fromer
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute, et. al.
Caleb Randall Trotter
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ctrotter@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543