Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-297
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-297
Title:Eric White, et al., Petitioners
v.
Barbara D. Underwood, Attorney General of New York, et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(59)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Waiver of right of respondents Barbara D. Underwood, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of The Seneca Nation of Indians and The Cayuga Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul John Cambria Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP
42 Deleware Avenue
Buffalo, NY 14202

pcambria@lglaw.com
716-849-1333
Party name: Eric White, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert M. Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
New York State Attorney General's Office
The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224-0341

robert.goldfarb@ag.ny.gov
518-776-2015
Party name: Barbara D. Underwood, et al.
Other
Carson Roy Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman, LLP
50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700
Buffalo, NY 14202

ccooper@lippes.com
7168535100
Party name: The Seneca Nation of Indians and The Cayuga Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543