Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-294
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-294
Title:Nicholas Honchariw, Petitioner
v.
County of Stanislaus, California, et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17256)
   Decision Date:March 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Waiver of right of respondents County of Stanislaus, CA, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 18 2018Response Requested. (Due November 19, 2018)
Nov 16 2018Brief of respondents County of Stanislaus, CA, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2018Reply of Nicholas Honchariw not accepted for filing. (December 03, 2018) (Corrected version submitted December 3, 2018)
Nov 29 2018Reply of petitioner Nicholas Honchariw filed. (12/3/2018)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Knick v. Township of Scott, 588 U. S. ___ (2019).
Jul 30 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas James Honchariw3 Via Paraiso West
Tiburon, CA 94920

nh@nhpart.com
415-225-3048
Party name: Nicholas Honchariw
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew D. Zinn
    Counsel of Record
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger LLP
396 Hayes St.
San Francisco, CA 94102

zinn@smwlaw.com
415-552-7272
Party name: County of Stanislaus, CA, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543