Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-292
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-292
Title:Detric Lewis, Petitioner
v.
Nicole English, Warden
Docketed:September 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3046)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2018 to November 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2018.
Nov 07 2018Memorandum of respondent in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 19 2018Reply of petitioner Detric Lewis filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 03 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 01 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Detric Lewis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Detric Lewis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Nicole English, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543