Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-277
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-277
Title:Urvashi Bhagat, Petitioner
v.
Andrei Iancu, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:September 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2525)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2018Waiver of right of respondent Iancu, Andrei to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 04 2018Amicus brief of Independent Inventors, Healthcare Professionals and Paul Gilbert Cole not accepted for filing. (October 12, 2018)
Oct 05 2018Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief out of time filed by Independent Inventors, et al. (Distributed)
OtherMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 22 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Urvashi Bhagat filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Independent Inventors, et al. DENIED.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence Henry Frank
    Counsel of Record
Liang, Frank & King LLP
520 White Plains Road, Suite 500
Tarrytown, NY 10591

lfrank@liangfrankking.com
9178823553
Party name: Urvashi Bhagat
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Iancu, Andrei
Other
Burman York Mathis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Burman Y Mathis
471 Riversider Dr
Harpers Ferry, WV 25425

budmathis@yahoo.com
703 901 1683
Party name: Independent Inventors, Healthcare Professionals and Paul Gilbert Cole

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543