Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-276
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-276
Title:Richard J. Baker, Petitioner
v.
Microsoft Corporation, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2357)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Richard J. Baker.
Blanket Consent
Oct 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent Ubisoft, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard J. Baker9 Deloraine Court, Mermaid Waters
Queensland, Australia, XX 4218

rb@personalised-video.com
(617) 5526 5523
Party name: Richard J. Baker
Attorneys for Respondents
Abran J. Kean
    Counsel of Record
Erise IP, P.A.
5600 Greenwood Plaza Blvd.
Suite 200
Greenwood Village, CO 80111

abran.kean@eriseip.com
913-777-5600
Party name: Ubisoft, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543