Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-268
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-268
Title:Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
Upstate Forever, et al.
Docketed:September 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1640)
   Decision Date:April 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., et al..
Blanket Consent
Sep 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2018 to November 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 5, 2018.
Oct 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Brief amici curiae of American Petroleum Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2018Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Brief of respondents Upstate Forever, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Reply of petitioners Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States on or before 4 p.m., Friday, January 4, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank Sharp Holleman III
    Counsel of Record
Southern Environmental Law Center
601 W Rosemary Street
Suite 220
Chapel Hill, NC 27516

fholleman@selcnc.org
919-967-1450
Party name: Upstate Forever, et al.
Other
David H. Coburn
    Counsel of Record
STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP
1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dcoburn@steptoe.com
202-429-3000
Party name: American Petroleum Institute, et al.
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia, et al.
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
713-229-1855
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Utility Water Act Group

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543