Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-267
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-267
Title:Electronic Privacy Information Center, Petitioner
v.
Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity, et al.
Docketed:August 31, 2018
Linked with 17A1406
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5171)
   Decision Date:December 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Application (17A1406) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 1, 2018 to August 30, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 26 2018Application (17A1406) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 30, 2018.
Aug 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2018.
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 30, 2018.
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 31, 2018 to November 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondents Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2018Reply of petitioner Electronic Privacy Information Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543