Docket for 18-266
|
Jun 07 2018 | Application (17A1354) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2018 to August 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | Main Document | Jun 07 2018 | Application (17A1354) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 30, 2018. | | | Aug 30 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 07 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Dutra Group. | | Blanket Consent | Sep 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 25 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Christopher Batterton. | | Blanket Consent | Sep 26 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Brief amici curiae of At-Sea Processors Association, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 01 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Maritime Law Association of the United States filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 30 2018 | Brief of respondent Christopher Batterton in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. | | | Nov 13 2018 | Reply of petitioner The Dutra Group filed.
(Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018. | | | Dec 07 2018 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Dec 21 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Dutra Group. | | Blanket Consent | Dec 28 2018 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner The Dutra Group. | | Main Document | Jan 08 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Christopher Batterton. | | Blanket ConsentProof of Service | Jan 14 2019 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. | | | Jan 17 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 22 2019 | Brief of petitioner The Dutra Group filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 22 2019 | Amicus brief of Dredging Contractors of America and Council for Dredging & Marine Construction Safety not accepted for filing. (Partial submission.) | | | Jan 22 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Dredging Contractors of America and Council for Dredging & Marine Construction Safety filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 25 2019 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 25, 2019 | | | Jan 28 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 28 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of The Inland River Harbor and Fleeting Coalition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amici curiae of At-Sea Processors Association, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and International Group of P&I Clubs filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Fishing Vessels' Reserve, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of American Maritime Association, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Drilling Contractors (IADC) filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amici curiae of The Greater New Orleans Barge Fleeting Association, Inc. and Offshore Marine Service Association filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Waterways Council, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 29 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of The American Waterways Operators filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 14 2019 | CIRCULATED | | | Feb 19 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Injured Crewmembers filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 21 2019 | Brief of respondent Christopher Batterton filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 21 2019 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. | | | Feb 21 2019 | Record from the U.S.C.A 9th Circuit and the District Court is electronic and located on PACER. | | | Feb 28 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Claimant Seeking Recovery For Wrongful Death Of Crewmember filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 28 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Sailors' Union of the Pacific filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 28 2019 | Amicus brief of American Association for Justice not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted). | | | Feb 28 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (March 7, 2019) (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 15 2019 | Reply of petitioner The Dutra Group filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 20 2019 | Letter of petitioner proposing to lodge copies of pleadings in cited case (The Rolph, 293 F. 269 [N.D. Ca. 1923], aff'd, 299 F. 52 [9th Cir. 1924]) filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Mar 25 2019 | Argued. For petitioner: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C. For respondent: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C. | | | Mar 28 2019 | Letter of respondent Christopher Batterton filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Jun 24 2019 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Kagan, Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. | | | Jul 26 2019 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|