Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-252
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-252
Title:Real Estate Alliance Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Move, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 28, 2018
Linked with 17A1385
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1463)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2018Application (17A1385) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 28, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 25 2018Application (17A1385) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 27, 2018.
Aug 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Sep 27 2018Brief of respondents Move, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2018Reply of petitioner Real Estate Alliance LTD. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence Alan Husick
    Counsel of Record
Lipton, Weinberger & Husick
P.O. Box 587
Southeaster, PA 19399-0587

lhusick@lwh-law.com
6102968259
Party name: Real Estate Alliance LTD.
Attorneys for Respondents
Henrik Davidson Parker
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
2929 Arch Street
12th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19104

hparker@bakerlaw.com
2155683100
Party name: Move, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543