Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-189
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-189
Title:Smartflash LLC, Petitioner
v.
Samsung Electronics America, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 14, 2018
Linked with 18A8
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2451, 2016-2452, 2016-2455, 2016-2457, 2016-2458, 2017-1056, 2017-1102, 2017-1104, 2017-1109, 2017-1110, 2017-1111, 2017-1833, 2017-1834, 2017-1835, 2017-1836, 2017-1837, 2017-1846, 2017-1847)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2018Application (18A8) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2018 to August 9, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Application (18A8) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 9, 2018.
Aug 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Waiver of right of Francisco, Noel J. United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondents Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Waiver of right of respondent Google, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 05 2018Reply of petitioner Smartflash LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Smartflash LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Melissa Bailey
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
50 California Street, 22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

melissabaily@quinnemanuel.com
415-875-6600
Party name: Google, LLC
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543