Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-185
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-185
Title:Connecticut, Petitioner
v.
Michael Skakel
Docketed:August 10, 2018
Linked with 18A103
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(SC 19251)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2018Application (18A103) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 2, 2018 to August 9, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 30 2018Application (18A103) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 9, 2018.
Aug 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent Michael Skakel to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 10 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Sep 20 2018Response Requested. (Due October 22, 2018)
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 26, 2018
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 26 2018Brief of respondent Michael Skakel in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Reply of petitioner Connecticut filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Arthur Killen
    Counsel of Record
Office of Chief State Attorney
300 Corporate Place
Rocky Hill, CT 06067

james.killen@ct.gov
(860) 258-5807
Party name: Connecticut
Attorneys for Respondent
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Michael Skakel
Other
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: States of Utah, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543