Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-182
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-182
Title:AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Gilead Sciences, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 9, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2475)
   Decision Date:May 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 10, 2018 to October 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 10, 2018, for all respondents.
Oct 01 2018Waiver of right of respondent Japan Tobacco Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 01 2018Waiver of right of respondent Gilead Sciences, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Paul Hipskind
    Counsel of Record
Berger & Hipskind LLP
9538 Brighton Way
Suite 320
Beverly Hills, CA 90210

dph@bergerhipskind.com
3238863430
Party name: AIDS Healthcare Foundation, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Laurie Webb Daniel
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
Regions Plaza
1180 West Peachtree Street NW, Suite 1800
Atlanta, GA 30309

laurie.daniel@hklaw.com
4044336430
Party name: Japan Tobacco Inc.
Gary N. Frischling
    Counsel of Record
Irell & Manella LLP
1800 Avenue of the Stars
Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90067

gfrischling@irell.com
310-277-1010
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543