Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-17
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-17
Title:Rodney Keister, Petitioner
v.
Stuart Bell, in His Official Capacity as President of the University of Alabama, et al.
Docketed:July 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11347)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 2, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 02 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Alliance Defending Freedom, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 02 2018Brief of respondents Stuart Bell, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Reply of petitioner Rodney Keister filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Alliance Defending Freedom, et al. GRANTED.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: Rodney Keister
Attorneys for Respondents
Sybil Vogtle Newton
    Counsel of Record
Starnes, Davis, Florie LLP
100 Brookwood Place, 7th Floor
Birmingham, AL 35209

svn@starneslaw.com
205-868-6000
Party name: Stuart Bell, et al.
Other
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, NE
Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

dcortman@adflegal.org
770-339-0774
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom and Young America's Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543