Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1585
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1585
Title:Kassim M. Nagi, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:June 27, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017 KA 1257)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 25, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2019Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 14 2019Response Requested. (Due September 13, 2019)
Aug 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2019 to November 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2019.
Nov 12 2019Brief of Louisiana in opposition not accepted for filing. (November 15, 2019)
Nov 12 2019Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. (11/20/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Reply of petitioner Kassim Nagi filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Apr 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, 590 U. S. ___ (2020). Justice Alito, concurring in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand: In this and in all other cases in which the Court grants, vacates, and remands in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, I concur in the judgment on the understanding that the Court is not deciding or expressing a view on whether the question was properly raised below but is instead leaving that question to be decided on remand. Justice Thomas would deny the petition for a writ of certiorari.
May 29 2020MANDATE ISSUED.
May 29 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark David Plaisance
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 1123
Prairieville, LA 70769

mark@plaisancelaw.com
(985) 227-4588
Party name: Kassim Nagi
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543