Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1584
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1584
Vide 18-1587
Title:United States Forest Service, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al.
Docketed:June 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1182
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1144)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2019Application (18A1182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2019 to June 25, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2019Application (18A1182) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 25, 2019.
Jun 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019 .
Jul 25 2019Brief amici curiae of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of The United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Brief amici curiae of American Forest Resource Council et al filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief of respondents Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 11 2019Reply of petitoner Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2019Reply of petitioner United States Forest Service, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 04 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-1587 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Oct 04 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1584. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1584. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 11 2019Blanket Consent filed by respondents, Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al. VIDED.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 05 2019Brief amicus curiae of Richard James Pierce Jr., in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Motion for an extension of time filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Nov 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including December 2, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 15, 2020. VIDED
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, February 24, 2020. VIDED.
Dec 02 2019Brief of Federal Petitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed). VIDED.
Main Document
Dec 02 2019Brief of petitioner Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC filed. (in 18-1587)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2019Amicus brief of American Forest Resource Council, et al. not accepted for filing. (December 09, 2019). (Corrected efiling submitted).
Dec 06 2019Brief amici curiae of American Forest Resource Council, et al. filed. (December 09, 2019). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Amicus brief of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. not accepted for filing. (December 09, 2019). (Corrected efiling to be submitted).
Dec 09 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed (December 09, 2019). VIDED
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief amici curiae of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of The United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Appalachian Trail Conservancy in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Representative Jeff Duncan and Sixty-One Additional Members of the United States House of Representatives filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Jan 15 2020Brief of respondents Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Niskanen Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Jan 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Pamela Underhill, Jonathan B. Jarvis, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, and National Parks Conservation Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020The record of the USCA 4th Circuit is available on PACER. Additionally, record material from USCA 4th Circuit has been electronically received.
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Natural Resources Defense Council, the Wilderness Society, and Defenders of Wildlife filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Wintergreen Property Owners Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of City of Staunton and Nelson County, Virginia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Vermont, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Virginia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Equal Rights Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2020Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners United States Forest Service, et al. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 14 2020Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner GRANTED. VIDED
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioners United States Forest Service, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioner Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC filed (in 18-1587). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Argued. For petitioners in 18-1584: Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For petitioner in 18-1587: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Michael K. Kellogg, Washington, D. C. VIDED.
Jun 15 2020Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Alito Gorsuch, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined, and in which Ginsburg, J., joined except as to Part III–B–2. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kagan, J., joined. VIDED.
Jul 17 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Forest Service, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al.
Other
Ellen O. Boardman
    Counsel of Record
O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue
5301 Wisconsin Avenue, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20015

eboardman@odonoghuelaw.com
2023620041
Party name: United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of The United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al.
David Gabriel Bookbinder
    Counsel of Record
Niskanen Center
820 First Street, NE
Suite 675
Washington, DC 20002

dbookbinder@niskanencenter.org
301-751-0611
Party name: Niskanen Center
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
1801 California Street, Suite 4900
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-830-1776
Party name: Appalachian Trail Conservancy
John Charles Cruden
    Counsel of Record
Beveridge & Diamond PC
1350 I Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

jcruden@bdlaw.com
2027896000
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
James J Devine Jr.
    Counsel of Record
128 Main Street
Oneida, NY 13421

jdevine@centralny.twcbc.com
3153636600
Party name: Citizens Equal Rights Foundation
William Stewart Eubanks II
    Counsel of Record
Eubanks & Associates, LLC
2601 S. Lemay Avenue
Unit 7-240
Fort Collins, CO 80525

bill@eubankslegal.com
9707036060
Party name: Pamela Underhill, Jonathan B. Jarvis, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, and National Parks Conservation Association
Lawson Emmett Fite
    Counsel of Record
700 N.E. Multnomah, Ste. 320
Portland, OR 97232

lfite@amforest.org
5032229505
Party name: American Forest Resource Council, et al.
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Wintergreen Property Owners Association, et al.
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sh@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council, the Wilderness Society, and Defenders of Wildlife
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia
Caleb Adam Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Environmental and Regulatory Law Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

cjaffe@law.virginia.edu
4349244776
Party name: City of Staunton and Nelson County, Virginia
Thomas Christian Jensen
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

tjensen@perkinscoie.com
(703) 304-5211
Party name: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Richard James Pierce Jr.
    Counsel of Record
george washington university
school of law, 2000 H Street,
Washington, DC 20052

rpierce@law.gwu.edu
7033041623
Party name: Richard James Pierce Jr.
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
2052513000
Party name: Representative Jeff Duncan and Sixty-One Additional Members of the United States House of Representatives
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia, et al.
Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood
    Counsel of Record
Vermont Attorney General's Office
109 State Street
Montpelier, VT 05609

eleanor.spottswood@vermont.gov
802-828-5500
Party name: State of Vermont, et al.
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543