Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1578
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1578
Title:Pfizer Inc., Petitioner
v.
Alida Adamyan, et al.
Docketed:June 25, 2019
Linked with 18A980
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-80059)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 25 2019Application (18A980) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 22, 2019 to June 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 28 2019Application (18A980) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 21, 2019.
Jun 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2019 to August 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 26, 2019.
Jul 25 2019Brief amici curiae of American Tort Reform Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief of respondents Alida Adamyan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Reply of petitioner Pfizer, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Pfizer, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jules Burton LeBlanc IV
    Counsel of Record
Baron & Budd, P.C.
2600 Citiplace Dr.
Baton Rouge, LA 70808

bleblanc@baronbudd.com
225-927-5441
Party name: Alida Adamyan, et al.
Bill Robins IIIRobins Cloud
808 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 450
Santa Monica, CA 90401

robins@robinscloud.com
310-929-4200
Party name: Alida Adamyan, et al.
Other
John H. Beisner
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

john.beisner@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: American Tort Reform Association, et al.
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543