Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1570
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1570
Title:Samuel Edelman, et ux., Petitioners
v.
New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, et al.
Docketed:June 24, 2019
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, First Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(156415, 156416, 156970, 156971)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 26, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Samuel Edelman, et ux.
Blanket Consent
Jul 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 24, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 26, 2019.
Jul 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Business Council of New York State, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Tax Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Academy of Attorney-Certified Public Accountants, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Professor Donald T. Williamson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief of respondents New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 11 2019Reply of petitioner Samuel Edelman, et ux. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Samuel Edelman, et ux.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey W. Lang
    Counsel of Record
New York State Office of Attorney General
The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224

jlang@ag.ny.gov
518-776-2027
Party name: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, et al.
Other
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
(202) 261-3300
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Professor Donald T. Williamson, et al.
Michele Berencsi Friend
    Counsel of Record
Clark & Trevithick
445 S. Figueroa St.
18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mfriend@clarktrev.com
213-629-5700
Party name: American Academy of Attorney-Certified Public Accountants, Inc.
Stephen P. B. Kranz
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

skranz@mwe.com
202-7568180
Party name: The Tax Foundation
Kyle Oliver Sollie
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
1717 Arch Street
Suite 3100
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ksollie@reedsmith.com
2158518852
Party name: The Business Council of New York State, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543