Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1569
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1569
Title:Richard Chamberlain, et ux., Petitioners
v.
New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, et al.
Docketed:June 24, 2019
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Third Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(525967)
   Decision Date:November 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 26, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Richard Chamberlain, et ux.
Blanket Consent
Jul 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 24, 2019 to August 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 26, 2019.
Aug 23 2019Brief of respondents New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 11 2019Reply of petitioner Richard Chamberlain, et ux. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Richard Chamberlain, et ux.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey W. Lang
    Counsel of Record
New York State Office of Attorney General
The Capitol
Albany, NY 12224

jlang@ag.ny.gov
518-776-2027
Party name: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543