Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1545
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1545
Title:Tracy Guerin, Petitioner
v.
Mickey Fowler, et al.
Docketed:June 14, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35052)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2019 to August 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2019.
Jul 09 2019Amicus brief of National Conference on Public Employee Retirement Systems not accepted for filing. (July 12, 2019)(Duplicate submission)
Jul 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Conference on Public Employee Retirement Systems filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Alaska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief of respondents Mickey Fowler, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Reply of petitioner Tracy Guerin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Benjamin Gonick
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General of Washinton
P.O. Box 40100 1125 Washington St. SE
Olympia, WA 98504

peterg@atg.wa.gov
3607536245
Party name: Tracy Guerin
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Kolden Strong
    Counsel of Record
Bendich, Stobaugh & Strong, PC
126 NW Canal Street, Suite 100
Seattle, WA 98107

skstrong@bs-s.com
2066223536
Party name: Mickey Fowler, et al.
Other
Laura Emily Wolff
    Counsel of Record
The State of Alaska
1031 4th Ave., Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

laura.wolff@alaska.gov
9072695100
Party name: State of Alaska
Robert D. Klausner
    Counsel of Record
Klausner, Kaufman, Jensen & Levinson
7080 N.W. 4th Street
Plantation, FL 33317

bob@robertdklausner.com
9549161202
Party name: National Conference on Public Employee Retirement Systems

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543