Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1538
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1538
Title:Dartmond Cherk, et al., Petitioners
v.
Marin County, California
Docketed:June 13, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A153579)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 13, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Dartmond Cherk, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 11 2019Amicus brief of California Association of Realtors not accepted for filing. (July 15, 2019)
Jul 11 2019Brief amici curiae of California Association of Realtors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 06 2019Response Requested. (Due September 5, 2019)
Aug 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 5, 2019 to October 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 7, 2019.
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to October 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 16, 2019.
Oct 16 2019Brief of Marin County, California in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence G. Salzman
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

lsalzman@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Dartmond Cherk, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Philip Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

brian.goldman@orrick.com
415-773-5676
Party name: Marin County, California
Tarisha K. BalOffice of the County Counsel
3501 Civic Center Drive
Room 275
San Rafael, CA 94903

tbal@marincounty.org
415-473-6117
Party name: Marin County, California
Other
June Babiracki Barlow
    Counsel of Record
California Assoc. of Realtor
525 S. Virgil Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90020

juneb@car.org
2137398277
Party name: California Association of Realtors
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
1121 L Street, Suite 700
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
9164983354
Party name: National Association of Home Builders, California Building Industry Association, and Citizen's Alliance for Property Rights Legal Fund
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543