Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1531
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1531
Title:South Carolina, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:June 11, 2019
Linked with 18A991
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1684)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2019Application (18A991) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 8, 2019 to June 7, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 29 2019Application (18A991) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 7, 2019.
Jun 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2019 to August 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2019.
Jul 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States Senator Lindsey Graham filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2019 to September 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 11, 2019.
Sep 11 2019Brief of respondent United States of America, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 24 2019Reply of petitioner State of South Carolina filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randolph Russell Lowell
    Counsel of Record
Willoughby & Hoefer, PA
133 River Landing Drive
Suite 200
Charleston, SC 29492

rlowell@willoughbyhoefer.com
843-619-4426
Party name: State of South Carolina
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America, et al.
Other
Morris Dawes Cooke Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Barnwell Whaley Patterson & Helms
288 Meeting Street, Suite 200
Charleston, SC 29401

mdc@barnwell-whaley.com
8435777700
Party name: United States Senator Lindsey Graham

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543