Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1515
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1515
Title:Eli Lilly and Company, Petitioner
v.
Erfindergemeinschaft UroPep GbR
Docketed:June 6, 2019
Linked with 18A1084
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2603)
   Decision Date:October 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 22 2019Application (18A1084) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 6, 2019 to June 5, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 25 2019Application (18A1084) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 5, 2019.
Jun 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent Erfindergemeinschaft UroPep GbR to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Eisai Co., Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2019)
Sep 18 2019Brief of respondent Erfindergemeinschaft UroPep GbR in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 02 2019Reply of petitioner Eli Lilly and Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Eli Lilly and Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W. Hubbard Street
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
7737507154
Party name: Erfindergemeinschaft UroPep GbR
Other
George William Hicks Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

george.hicks@kirkland.com
202-389-5000
Party name: Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Aventisub LLC, f/d/b/a Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1700
Party name: Eisai Inc.
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543