Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-15
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-15
Title:James L. Kisor, Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:July 2, 2018
Linked with 17A1154
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1929)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 31, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2018Application (17A1154) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 1, 2018 to June 29, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 24 2018Application (17A1154) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 29, 2018.
Jun 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2018 to August 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2018.
Jul 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation and The Beacon Center of Tennessee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Brief amici curiae of The State's of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2018 to October 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 1, 2018.
Sep 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 31, 2018.
Oct 31 2018Brief of respondent Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 19 2018Reply of petitioner James L. Kisor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 10 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jan 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Blanket Consent
Jan 24 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2019Brief of petitioner James L. Kisor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 27, 2019
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of State and Local Government Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of ServiceOther
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Utility Air Regulatory Group filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Thomas Merrill filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors - Dean Ronald A. Cass, Christopher DeMuth, Sr., and James L. Huffman filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center and American Immigration Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Veterans’ Advocates, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Stephen C. Connaker and the Military and Veterans' Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors of Administrative Law and Federal Regulation in support of neither party filed. (Corrected version submitted)
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors of Administrative Law and Federal Regulation in support of neither party filed (2/14/19). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Sergeant Major Jeff S. Howard (Retired) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOther
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Feb 25 2019Brief of respondent Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2019The record received from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on PACER. The record is complete.
Feb 28 2019The record received from U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims are electronic and located on USCAVC web site. Also received are the pleadings from USCAVC which is confidential, (1 Envelope).
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Sheldon Whitehouse filed. ((Distributed).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2019Reply of petitioner James L. Kisor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Argued. For petitioner: Paul W. Hughes, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Noel G. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: James L. Kisor
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Jean-Claude Andre
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 W. Fifth Street
Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90013

jcandre@sidley.com
(213) 896-6000
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center and American Immigration Lawyers Association
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Michael Patrick Bracken
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

mbracken@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance
William James Brown Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brown Wegner LLP
2010 Main Street, Suite 1260
Irvine, CA 92614

bill@brownwegner.com
9497050080
Party name: Stephen C. Connaker, et al.
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Chapman University, Fowler School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State's of Utah, et al.
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
(770) 977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: ADMINISTRATIVE LAW SCHOLARS
Sheldon Whitehouse
    Counsel of Record
Hart Senate Offic Bldg. Ste. Rm. 530
Washington, DC 20017

counsel@whitehouse.senate.gov
(202) 224-2921
Party name: Senator Sheldon Whitehouse
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
512-322-2500
Party name: National Association of Home Builders, et al.
Ronald Andrew Cass
    Counsel of Record
Cass & Associates, PC
10560 Fox Forest Drive
Great Falls, VA 22066

roncass@cassassociates.net
202.438.7590
Party name: Professors - Dean Ronald A. Cass, Christopher DeMuth, Sr., and James L. Huffman
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
11325 N. Community House Road, Suite 250
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Anthony Lee Francois
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

alf@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Matthew James Ginsburg
    Counsel of Record
American Fed. of Labor and Congress of Industrial
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mginsburg@aflcio.org
202-637-5397
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: State and Local Government Associations
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Professor Thomas Merrill
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.472.2356
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
6468375151
Party name: PROFESSORS OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW AND FEDERAL REGULATION
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Utility Air Regulatory Group
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: National Organization of Veterans’ Advocates, Inc., et al.
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
106 East Sixth Street
Suite 900
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
5126863940
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Amy Mason Saharia
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

asaharia@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute, et al.
Shawn Terry Welch
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart, LLP
222 South Main Street, Suite 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

stwelch@hollandhart.com
8017995800
Party name: Jeff S. Howard

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543