Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1490
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1490
Title:Court of Common Pleas of Pennsylvania, Bucks County, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jason Piasecki
Docketed:May 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4175)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 31, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 31, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 30, 2019.
Aug 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2019 to September 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 30, 2019.
Sep 30 2019Brief of respondent Jason Piasecki in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jill Marie Graziano
    Counsel of Record
Bucks County District Attorney's Office
100 N. Main Street
Doylestown, PA 18901

jmgraziano@buckscounty.org
215-348-6084
Party name: Court of Common Pleas of Pennsylvania, Bucks County
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Jason Piasecki

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543