Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-149
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-149
Title:Doug Lair, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jeff Mangan, in His Official Capacity as Commissioner of Political Practices, et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35424)
   Decision Date:October 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2018Waiver of right of respondent Jeff Mangan, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of WIsconsin Institute for Law & Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Amicus brief of The Legacy Foundation not accepted for filing. (September 11, 2018) Attorney submitted brief three times.
Sep 04 2018Amicus brief of The Legacy Foundation not accepted for filing. (September 11, 2018) Attorney submitted brief three times.
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Legacy Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 14 2018Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2018)
Oct 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2018 to November 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Brief of respondents Jeff Mangan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2018Reply of petitioners Doug Lair, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: Doug Lair, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Dale Michael Schowengerdt
    Counsel of Record
Montana Department of Justice
215 N. Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

dales@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: Jeff Mangan, et al.
Other
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@ifs.org
703-894-6846
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
Bloodgood House, 1139 E. Knapp Street
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: WIsconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: The Legacy Foundation
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Barnaby Zall
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@aol.com
360-378-6600
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543