Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1460
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1460
Vide 18-1323
Title:Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, Petitioner
v.
June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Docketed:May 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30397)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 24, 2019 to August 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2019.
Jun 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Josh Hawley filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Amicus brief of 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Hurt By Abortion and The Justice Foundation not accepted for filing. (June 24, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Jun 24 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Amicus brief of American Center for Law and Justice not accepted for filing. (June 27, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief amici curiae of 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Hurt By Abortion and The Justice Foundation filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief of June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Gee, Dr. Rebekah
Attorneys for Respondents
Travis J. Tu
    Counsel of Record
The Center for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street
New York, NY 10038

tjtu@reprorights.org
9176373627
Party name: June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Other
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 West Washington Street
IGC South, Fifth Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46205

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.
Joshua David Hawley
    Counsel of Record
N/A
212 Russell Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20510

ellen_james@hawley.senate.gov
202-224-6154
Party name: Senator Josh Hawley
Rachel Nicole Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 500
Washnington, DC 20036

rachel.morrison@aul.org
202-741-4902
Party name: Americans United for Life
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Hurt By Abortion and The Justice Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543